AZ HB2518 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prosecution expenses; county reimbursement; repeal
Title
Prosecution expenses; county reimbursement; repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-23-4-0) |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-14 | House | House LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Clerk Of Court
Department Of Administration
Department Of Corrections
Governor
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Department Of Administration
Department Of Corrections
Governor
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 226 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 227 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |