AZ HB2517 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Chapter 245 E
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Chapter 245 E
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Internet crimes against children; fund
Title
Internet crimes against children; fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Chapter 245 E | |
2015-04-09 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-04-01 | House | House final reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2015-04-01 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-20 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2015-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-0-0-2-0) |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |