AZ HB2514 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

HURF distribution; cities, towns, counties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HURF distribution; cities, towns, counties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2018-03-20SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-20-4-0)
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-14HouseHouse TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House TI Committee
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
286535New CodeSee Bill Text
286538Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70744
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2514p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2514h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.25140120.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2514transit.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70744&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70744&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70744&billStatusActionId=181366&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70744&billStatusActionId=181576&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70744&billStatusActionId=181646&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70744&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70744&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback