AZ HB2512 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Water program amendments.
Title
Water program amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-27-0-0) |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-13 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Board Of Supervisors
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Counties - Title 11
Department Of Environmental Quality
Department Of Water Resources
Municipalities
Natural Resource Conservation Districts
Public Lands - Title 37
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
State Land Department
Water Programs
Waters - Title 45
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Counties - Title 11
Department Of Environmental Quality
Department Of Water Resources
Municipalities
Natural Resource Conservation Districts
Public Lands - Title 37
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
State Land Department
Water Programs
Waters - Title 45
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 118 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 2103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 2106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 2113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 292 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 462 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 465.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 561 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 563 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 563.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 568 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 568.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 568.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 568.05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 574 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 3702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 3713.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |