AZ HB2509 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-20)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Lees Ferry bell; governmental mall.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lees Ferry bell; governmental mall.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-15HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback