AZ HB2508 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recalls; city elections; signatures required

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recalls; city elections; signatures required

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-02-11HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2020-01-29HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19201Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback