AZ HB2508 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recalls; city elections; signatures required
Title
Recalls; city elections; signatures required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |