AZ HB2502 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation of solar energy property
Title
Taxation of solar energy property
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Governor Vetoed | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-28 | Senate third reading , voting: (15-15-0-0) | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Consent Calendar April 21, 2010 @ 5:20 PM with Objections | |
2010-04-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-09 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-04 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-04 | House third reading , voting: (44-11-4-0) | |
2010-02-15 | House Consent Calendar February 15, 2010 @ 1:30 PM | |
2010-02-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-16 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in House and read first time |