AZ HB2500 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Real estate signs; cities; counties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real estate signs; cities; counties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-27SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-02-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (39-20-1-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-13HouseHouse FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House FPRPP Committee
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11269.20New CodeSee Bill Text
9500.41New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback