AZ HB2498 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Historic preservation; rangeland improvements; requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historic preservation; rangeland improvements; requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16 Governor Vetoed
2018-05-03 Transmitted to Governor
2018-05-03HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (31-28-1-0)
2018-05-03HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-12HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-09HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-14SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-03-12SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (44-11-5-0)
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-08HouseHouse LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-31HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2018-01-30HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41511.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41862Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70607
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2498p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2498h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2498s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.24980156.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2498nrew.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70607&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70607&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70607&billStatusActionId=181624&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70607&billStatusActionId=181688&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70607&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70607&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70607&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70607&billStatusActionId=182922&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70607&billStatusActionId=183104&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70607&billStatusActionId=183715&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70607&billStatusActionId=183723&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback