AZ HB2498 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prepaid legal insurance; capital requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prepaid legal insurance; capital requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateChapter 326
2017-05-22SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-10SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-09HouseTransmit to House
2017-05-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2017-05-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-05-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-15SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-25-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-22HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-4-0-2-0-0)
2017-02-15HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2017-02-14HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201097.10Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69511
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2498p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2498h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0326.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69511&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69511&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69511&billStatusActionId=175705&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69511&billStatusActionId=175679&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69511&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69511&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69511&billStatusActionId=177509&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69511&billStatusActionId=177541&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback