AZ HB2498 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Referred to Senate FIN Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Referred to Senate FIN Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cigarette tax stamps; distributor discount
Title
Cigarette tax stamps; distributor discount
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2016-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |