AZ HB2494 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Senate ED Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Senate ED Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona health education centers; increase.
Title
Arizona health education centers; increase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-22-1-0) |
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |