AZ HB2494 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil liability; vehicles; minors; animals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil liability; vehicles; minors; animals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11SenateChapter 301
2017-05-11SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-10SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-10HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (35-20-5-0)
2017-05-10HouseHouse concurs
2017-04-11HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-11HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-05HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-7-3-0)
2017-04-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-23SenateSenate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-03-14SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2017-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-16HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-09HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2017-02-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321211Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69506
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2494p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2494h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2494s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0301.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.24941202.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2494jud.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69506&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69506&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69506&billStatusActionId=175523&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69506&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69506&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69506&billStatusActionId=176805&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69506&billStatusActionId=176843&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69506&billStatusActionId=177642&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69506&billStatusActionId=177611&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback