AZ HB2492 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; verification; citizenship
Title
Voter registration; verification; citizenship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Motion Representative Toma motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(O) HB 2492 be referred for an additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Motion Representative Toma motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(O) HB 2492 be referred for an additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 99 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-3-0) |
2022-02-28 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-28 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Causes For Cancellation (s)
Citizenship
Classification (s)
Driver License Voter Registration (s)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Eligibility (s)
Federal Only Voters (s)
Investigation (s)
Qualification Of Electors
Registration Of Electors
Report (s)
Severability
Verification
Violation (s)
Voter Registration
Citizenship
Classification (s)
Driver License Voter Registration (s)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Eligibility (s)
Federal Only Voters (s)
Investigation (s)
Qualification Of Electors
Registration Of Electors
Report (s)
Severability
Verification
Violation (s)
Voter Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 121.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 123 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 127 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 134 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 143 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |