AZ HB2490 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; critical infrastructure information
Title
Technical correction; critical infrastructure information
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-06 | Senate third reading , voting: (25-4-1-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Consent Calendar March 14, 2011 @ 1:10 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-2-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House third reading , voting: (44-13-3-0) | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2011-02-15 | House read second time | |
2011-02-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced in House and read first time |