AZ HB2486 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clinical research; psilocybin; grants; appropriation
Title
Clinical research; psilocybin; grants; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-01 | House | House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriation
Clinical Research
Grants
Psilocybin
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Research Grants
Whole Mushroom Psilocybin
Clinical Research
Grants
Psilocybin
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Research Grants
Whole Mushroom Psilocybin