AZ HB2486 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-16-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-16-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Study committee on county boundaries
Title
Study committee on county boundaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-16-1-0) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2019-03-11 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-31-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-2-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |