AZ HB2485 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Parked vehicles blocking sidewalk; prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parked vehicles blocking sidewalk; prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-09SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-09SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-03-06SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-03-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (48-12-0-0)
2020-03-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2020-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-05HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2020-01-29HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28873Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73161
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2485p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2485h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2485biasiucci.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2485transportation.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73161&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73161&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73161&billStatusActionId=195365&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73161&billStatusActionId=195403&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback