AZ HB2483 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Chapter 48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Chapter 48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers; title information
Title
Motor vehicle dealers; title information
Sponsors
Rep. Drew John [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Chapter 48 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-6-1-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-4-2-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 377 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4537 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4538 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |