AZ HB2482 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Municipality; general plan; adoption; amendment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipality; general plan; adoption; amendment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-22SenateChapter 166
2022-04-22SenateGovernor Signed
2022-04-18SenateTransmitted to Governor
2022-04-13HouseTransmit to House
2022-04-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-0-5-0)
2022-03-08SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2022-03-08SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2022-03-07SenateSenate consent calendar
2022-03-07SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2022-02-28SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2022-02-22SenateSenate read second time
2022-02-21SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2022-02-21SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2022-02-21SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2022-02-18SenateTransmit to Senate
2022-02-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2022-02-08HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-08HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-07HouseHouse consent calendar
2022-02-07HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2022-02-02HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-26HouseHouse read second time
2022-01-25HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2022-01-25HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2022-01-25HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9461.06Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76984
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2482p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2482h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/laws/0166.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/492793
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/493089
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/494866
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/495842
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/498583
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/498886
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76984&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76984&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76984&billStatusActionId=208465&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76984&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76984&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76984&billStatusActionId=210936&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback