AZ HB2476 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; isolation rooms; restrictions
Title
Schools; isolation rooms; restrictions
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Rep. Adam Kwasman [R] |
Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Sen. Warren Petersen [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor Signed | |
2013-03-28 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-03-28 | House | House final reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2013-03-28 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-03-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-26 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-2-1-0) |
2013-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |