AZ HB2475 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Water use; criminal penalty; wells

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water use; criminal penalty; wells

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateChapter 274
2019-06-06SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-23SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-23HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (32-28-0-0)
2019-05-21HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2019-05-21HouseHouse final reading FAILED, voting: (29-31-0-0)
2019-05-21HouseHouse concurs
2019-04-23HouseHouse minority caucus
2019-04-23HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-16HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2019-04-09SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-21SenateSenate WAG Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (3-2-2-0)
2019-03-06SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Senate WAG Committee
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0)
2019-02-19HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-4-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-14HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45112Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71612
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2475p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2475h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2475s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0274.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.24750324.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2475wag.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71612&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71612&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71612&billStatusActionId=187375&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71612&billStatusActionId=187604&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71612&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71612&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71612&billStatusActionId=188862&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71612&billStatusActionId=188974&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71612&billStatusActionId=189659&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71612&billStatusActionId=189661&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71612&billStatusActionId=189722&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71612&billStatusActionId=189723&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback