AZ HB2471 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Credit unions; actions; meetings
Title
Credit unions; actions; meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Chapter 332 | |
2016-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | House final reading , voting: (54-0-6-0) |
2016-05-07 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |