AZ HB2469 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Chapter 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Fire district consolidation, merger

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire district consolidation, merger

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateChapter 130
2019-04-24SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-18SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-18HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-04-18HouseHouse concurs
2019-04-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-16HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-09HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2019-04-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-18SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2019-03-06SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0)
2019-02-28HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2019-02-27HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0)
2019-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0)
2019-02-14HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
48805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48805.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48823Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71606
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2469p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2469h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2469s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0130.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2469rules.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71606&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71606&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71606&billStatusActionId=187243&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71606&billStatusActionId=187383&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71606&billStatusActionId=187495&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71606&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71606&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71606&billStatusActionId=188788&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71606&billStatusActionId=188866&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71606&billStatusActionId=189031&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71606&billStatusActionId=189035&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback