AZ HB2467 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Committees; west basin water users

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Committees; west basin water users

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Transmitted to Governor
2019-05-16HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (22-4-4-0)
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-21SenateSenate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0)
2019-03-13SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate WAG Committee
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (53-7-0-0)
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2019-03-05HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-05HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-19HouseHouse NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71604
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2467p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2467h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2467griffin2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2467griffin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2467natural resources energy water.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71604&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71604&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71604&billStatusActionId=187927&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71604&billStatusActionId=188048&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71604&billStatusActionId=188167&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71604&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71604&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71604&billStatusActionId=189270&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71604&billStatusActionId=189607&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback