AZ HB2466 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil action; assault; limitation; applicability
Title
Civil action; assault; limitation; applicability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Senate | Chapter 259 |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-27 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2019-05-27 | House | House concurs |
2019-05-27 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2019-05-27 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Child Safety - Title 8
Criminal Code - Title 13
Juvenile Corrections
Juvenile Court
Probation
Victims' Rights
Criminal Code - Title 13
Juvenile Corrections
Juvenile Court
Probation
Victims' Rights
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 4402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4417 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4437 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
22 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
22 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 383 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 387 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 388 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 396 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 398 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |