AZ HB2466 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - House motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - House motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appraisals; allegations; complaints
Title
Appraisals; allegations; complaints
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (18-40-2-0) |
2017-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-02-13 | House | House BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to House BI Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 3601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3641 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3654 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3656 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3677 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |