AZ HB2458 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Legislation replaced by SB1420

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; universities; consular identification cards..

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; universities; consular identification cards..

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-16HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-28HouseHouse GE Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1420 (Replaced by) 2021-03-05 - Chapter 42

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415001Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75050
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2458p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2458h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484149
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484805
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485626
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486121
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487208
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488168
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75050&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75050&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75050&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75050&billStatusActionId=201615&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback