AZ HB2457 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rural STEM program; tax credits
Title
Rural STEM program; tax credits
Sponsors
Rep. Becky Nutt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 302 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-08 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (50-10-0-0) |
2017-05-08 | House | House concurs |
2017-05-02 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-05-02 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-04-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-2-0) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-20-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-16 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 249.07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1075 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1163 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |