AZ HB2456 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular


Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]


National popular vote; interstate agreement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


National popular vote; interstate agreement


Roll Calls

2016-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2016-01-26SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-05-07SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-05-07SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-02-05HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-02-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (40-16-4-0)
2016-02-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-02-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2016-01-25HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-02-01HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-0-0)
2016-01-26HouseReferred to House ELECT Committee
2016-01-26HouseHouse read second time
2016-01-25HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-01-25HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2016-01-25HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

Bill Comments