AZ HB2455 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Senate FIN Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Senate FIN Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Fire districts; pension liability; financing.
Title
Fire districts; pension liability; financing.
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-1-0-2-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Emergency
Financing
Fire Districts
Pension Liability
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Emergency
Financing
Fire Districts
Pension Liability
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 805.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |