AZ HB2454 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Sexual assault; rental agreement termination

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual assault; rental agreement termination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-14HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-24HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-23HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-01-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
331318Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback