AZ HB2453 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Chapter 36 E
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Synthetic drugs; reporting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Synthetic drugs; reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-15 Chapter 36 E
2014-04-15 Governor Signed
2014-04-10 Transmitted to Governor
2014-04-09SenateTransmit to House
2014-04-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2014-03-11SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-11SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-02-25SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-03SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0)
2014-02-26SenateReferred to Senate JUD Committee
2014-02-26SenateSenate read second time
2014-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2014-02-25SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2014-02-21HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-02-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2014-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0)
2014-01-30HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-02-06HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
2014-02-03HouseReferred to House JUD Committee
2014-02-03HouseHouse read second time
2014-01-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-01-30HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2014-01-30HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback