AZ HB2451 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - House third reading FAILED voting: (24-35-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Government; passwords; data encryption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government; passwords; data encryption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (24-35-1-0)
2017-02-22HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2017-02-21HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (20-38-2-0)
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-16HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-08HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18522Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69460
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2451p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2451h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69460&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69460&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69460&billStatusActionId=175373&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69460&billStatusActionId=175435&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69460&billStatusActionId=175307&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69460&billStatusActionId=176382&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback