AZ HB2451 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Chapter 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Release of prisoners; detainers; repeal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Release of prisoners; detainers; repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30 Chapter 89
2016-03-30 Governor Signed
2016-03-29 Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-24SenateTransmit to House
2016-03-24SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2016-03-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-03-08SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-08SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-07SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-02-23SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-02SenateSenate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0)
2016-02-24SenateReferred to Senate PSMT Committee
2016-02-24SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-23SenateAssigned to Senate PSMT Committee
2016-02-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-02-19HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-02-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-21-3-0)
2016-02-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-02-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2016-01-25HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-01-28HouseHouse MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0)
2016-01-26HouseReferred to House MAPS Committee
2016-01-26HouseHouse read second time
2016-01-25HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-01-25HouseAssigned to House MAPS Committee
2016-01-25HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback