AZ HB2450 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Genetic testing information; confidentiality; exceptions
Title
Genetic testing information; confidentiality; exceptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Health Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Health Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-08 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 2802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 448 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 448.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |