AZ HB2446 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Senate CED Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Senate CED Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Alarm businesses and agents
Title
Alarm businesses and agents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Senate CED Committee action: Held | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-11 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | House third reading , voting: (47-10-2-0) | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-22 | House Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:00 PM with Objections | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-15 | House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-10 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-01-21 | House read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |