AZ HB2445 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Chapter 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

TPT; residential rentals; notice

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TPT; residential rentals; notice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateChapter 53
2019-04-09SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-03HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurs
2019-04-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-02HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-03-26HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-26SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0)
2019-02-26SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-15SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-14HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-02-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-11HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-11HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-06HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
426011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71582
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2445p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2445h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2445s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0053.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.24451004.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2445fin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2445floormesnard.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71582&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71582&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71582&billStatusActionId=186579&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71582&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71582&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71582&billStatusActionId=188647&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71582&billStatusActionId=188691&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71582&billStatusActionId=188751&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71582&billStatusActionId=188755&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback