AZ HB2440 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

VLT exemption; veteran amputees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VLT exemption; veteran amputees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (38-20-2-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-01-31HouseHouse TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House TI Committee
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
285802Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback