AZ HB2435 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - House third reading FAILED voting: (15-44-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; governing boards; elections; revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; governing boards; elections; revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (15-44-1-0)
2021-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2021-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-18HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-11HouseHouse ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2021-01-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16317Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74997
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2435p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2435h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2435hoffman.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2435government elections.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484313
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485007
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486118
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74997&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74997&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74997&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74997&billStatusActionId=201681&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74997&billStatusActionId=201943&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74997&billStatusActionId=202645&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback