AZ HB2435 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

English language learners; instruction; budgeting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

English language learners; instruction; budgeting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2018-04-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-08SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-1-3-0)
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-12HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.06Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
15756.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.08Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.10Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.11Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
15756.12Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70298
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2435p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2435h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2435boyer.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2435education.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.24350215.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2435ed.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70298&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70298&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70298&billStatusActionId=181477&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70298&billStatusActionId=181509&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70298&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70298&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70298&billStatusActionId=183376&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback