AZ HB2434 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Financial products; regulatory exemption program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial products; regulatory exemption program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateChapter 44
2018-03-22SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-21SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-21HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-21SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-14SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-22-4-0)
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-06HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411491.10Amended CodeSee Bill Text
441531.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70282
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2434p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2434h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0044.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2434weninger2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2434commerce.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70282&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70282&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70282&billStatusActionId=181323&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70282&billStatusActionId=181355&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70282&billStatusActionId=181543&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70282&billStatusActionId=181594&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70282&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70282&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70282&billStatusActionId=182592&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70282&billStatusActionId=182609&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback