AZ HB2430 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Immunizations; reimbursement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immunizations; reimbursement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-02 Governor Signed
2013-05-01 Transmitted to Governor
2013-05-01HouseHouse final reading , voting: (32-25-3-0)
2013-05-01HouseHouse Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2013-04-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2013-04-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2013-04-17SenateTransmit to House
2013-04-17SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-3-3-0)
2013-04-09SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2013-03-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2013-03-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2013-03-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment
2013-03-12SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2013-03-20SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2013-03-13SenateReferred to Senate HHS Committee
2013-03-13SenateSenate read second time
2013-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2013-03-18SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2013-03-12SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2013-03-08HouseTransmit to Senate
2013-03-07HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-22-2-0)
2013-03-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2013-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2013-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2013-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0)
2013-02-06HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2013-02-20HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
2013-02-07HouseReferred to House HEALTH Committee
2013-02-07HouseHouse read second time
2013-02-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2013-02-06HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2013-02-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=110&Bill_Number=HB2430
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2430p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2430h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2430s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/laws/0173.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/proposed/h.2430kbm2.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/adopted/h.2430-health.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/adopted/h.2430-f2-brophymcgee.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/proposed/s.2430112.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/proposed/s.24301132.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/adopted/s.2430hhs.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/adopted/2430barto855.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2430.hhealth.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2430.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2430.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2430.shhs.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2430.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2430.hfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback