AZ HB2429 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tax corrections act of 2021
Title
Tax corrections act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Shawnna Bolick [R] | Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Chapter 196 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurs |
2021-04-07 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-07 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Credit (h)
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Renewable Energy Facilities (h)
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Tax Corrections Act Of 2021
Taxation (h)
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Tobacco (h)
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Renewable Energy Facilities (h)
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Tax Corrections Act Of 2021
Taxation (h)
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Tobacco (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 1030 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1072.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1074.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1087 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1089.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1164.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1168 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |