AZ HB2429 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - House third reading FAILED voting: (17-42-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - House third reading FAILED voting: (17-42-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; EORP contributions; counties
Title
Appropriations; EORP contributions; counties
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] | Rep. Jay Lawrence [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (17-42-1-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-07 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |