AZ HB2429 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of public safety; continuation
Title
Department of public safety; continuation
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Terri Proud [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Governor Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | House final reading , voting: (23-7-0-0) | |
2012-04-04 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-04 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-03 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-03 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-06 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-06 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-05 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-06 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-23 | House Consent Calendar January 23, 2012 @ 1:26 PM | |
2012-01-26 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-18 | House read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in House and read first time |