AZ HB2428 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - House NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-1-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

No-water urinals required; public buildings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

No-water urinals required; public buildings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-1-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-11HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-31HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11277New CodeSee Bill Text
34402New CodeSee Bill Text
45311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45313.01Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
9500.46New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback