AZ HB2420 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; prescription drugs; step therapy
Title
Insurance; prescription drugs; step therapy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |