AZ HB2420 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-15)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (11-2-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Veterans' services; benefits counselors; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' services; benefits counselors; appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-19HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (11-2-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-29HouseHouse MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House MVRA Committee
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback